Argo Nevada LLC v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Argo Nevada LLC |
Defendant: |
Green Tree Servicing, LLC and National Default Servicing Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02035 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 9, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to vacate motion for judgment debtor examination. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting 33 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam and 35 Motion for Production of Documents. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 5/10/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
29
JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Green Tree Servicing, LLC against Argo Nevada LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Dismiss. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC and against plaintiff Argo Nevada LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, unless this matter is disposed of, the parties shall file a Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than twenty (20) days after Defendant files an answer or on November 13, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER Granting Limited Stay of Discovery re 18 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all discovery is stayed in this case until the earlier of twenty (20) days after Defendant files an answer or July 13, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant National Default Servicing Corporation. It is ordered that this action be dismissed with prejudice as to National Default Servicing Corporation. It is ordered that 8 Motion to Dismiss is withdrawn. It is ordered that the bond posted by the Plaintiff in the amount of $1,000.00 shall be released. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc Finance Dept TR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?