Federal National Mortgage Association et al v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association |
Defendant: |
SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sun City Aliante Community Association |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02046 |
Filed: |
December 5, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
119
ORDER that 118 Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Report is GRANTED; the parties have until January 13, 2017, to file their joint report. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
111
ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
106
ORDER that 97 Plaintiffs' Objection to the Magistrate Judge's January 12, 2016, Minute Order is OVERRULED, and their request to vacate that order is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 98 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay the Magistra te Judge's January 12, 2016, Minute Order Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs' Objection is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 69 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; 70 Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice; 88 SFR Invest ments Pool 1, LLC's Request for Judicial Notice; 91 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for FRCP 56(d) Relief; and 105 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record are DENIED without prejudice to the filing of new briefing with the limitations set forth above. Plaintiffs have until March 11, 2016, to file a renewed motion for summary judgment that complies with the limitations above. After that, the briefing schedule will proceed under Local Rule 7-2. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
64
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss: the claims against Doe and Roe Defendants are Dismissed; the motion is Denied in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sun City Aliante Community Association's [35 ] Motion to Dismiss is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 54 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply in Opposition to SFR's Motion to Dismiss and SFR Investment's 56 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Surreply are Denied. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing
46
ORDER that 44 Motion to Stay Discovery is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 26, 2015 |
Filing
31
ORDER that 29 Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney Kaleb D. Anderson is substituted in place and stead of Ryan D Hastings for Sun City Aliante Community Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?