Sprint Nextel Corporation et al v. Ace Wholesale, INC et al
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Defendant: Ace Wholesale, INC, Jason Floarea, Eric Mandreger, Dominick Lanore, Tony Archie, Jose Genel, Barney Gunn, Coptrade, INC. and Moshe Alezra
Case Number: 2:2014cv02119
Filed: December 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Civil Case administratively closed per 57 Minute Order. (SLD)
July 30, 2018 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/30/2018. The Clerk of Court is instructed to administratively close this case until such time as the arrest warrants in this case have been executed. If or when the warrants are executed, the case will be reopened. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that arrest warrants are issued for Gopal Agarwal and Amin Ali, the only two principals to be personally served in this case. They shall be detained until they purge themselves of their civil contempt. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE in Support of #49 Motion for Contempt by Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation . (Rickard, Jarrod) Modified text on 1/29/2018 (EDS).
January 24, 2018 Filing 55 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/24/2018 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Michael Foster, Esq., Jarrod Rickard, Esq.; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 2:13 PM - 2:20 PM; Courtroom: 7D.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of counsel regarding the #49 Motion for Contempt Order re #43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #49 Motion for Contempt Order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Supplement to #49 Motion to include the request for arrest warrants for civil contempt in this case and submission of a proposed Order in WORD format to the courtroom deputy. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #51 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael S. Foster and approving Attorney Jarrod L. Rickard as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/23/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 22, 2018 Filing 52 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #49 Motion by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Rickard, Jarrod)
January 22, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael S. Foster and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jarrod L. Rickard (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4938276) by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Rickard, Jarrod)
January 16, 2018 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/16/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding #49 MOTION for Contempt Order re #43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees is set for Wednesday, January 24, 2018 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are directed to file a proposed contempt order for the Court's consideration prior to the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 6, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION for Contempt Order re #43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Responses due by 7/20/2017. (Rickard, Jarrod)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #47 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Carlos Blumberg and Gail E. Podolsky as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2017 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gail Podolsky, Carlos Blumberg by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Podolsky, Gail)
April 4, 2017 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Rickard, Jarrod)
April 4, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jarrod L. Rickard on behalf of Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Rickard, Jarrod)
February 28, 2017 Filing 44 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Digitek Telecom, its principal, Gopal Agarwal, Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., its principal, Avinash Gandhi, Ali Sadaqa Trading LC, its principal, Amin Ali, New WayInternational Ltd., its principal, Nigel Prince, World Mobile Co., its principal, Shirley Li, J2 International Ltd., and its principal Jacky Xie., joint and severally shall pay Plaintiffs' attorneys in the amount of $34,991.65. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #38 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs from Third Parties. The Court finds Digitek Telecom, its principal, Gopal Agarwal, Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., its princ ipal, Avinash Gandhi, Ali Sadaqa Trading LC, its principal, Amin Ali, New WayInternational Ltd., its principal, Nigel Prince, World Mobile Co., its principal, Shirley Li, J2 International Ltd., and its principal Jacky Xie., joint and severally liable for this amount and directs them to pay Plaintiffs' attorneys $34,991.65 by 4/3/2017. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a notice with the Court no later than 4/4/2017 to address whether Third Parties have complied with this Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2016 Filing 42 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #35 Order addressed to World Mobile Co.Envelope marked: Return. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (NEV)
August 1, 2016 Filing 41 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #37 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
August 1, 2016 Filing 40 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #35 Order addressed to Ali Sadaqa Trading LLC. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
July 27, 2016 Filing 39 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #37 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
July 14, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from Third Parties by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Responses due by 7/31/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Podolsky, Gail)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that third party Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. shall pay Sprint's attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $28,818.51. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Worldwide Mobile Trading shall designate one or more officers, directors, managing agents or other persons knowledgeable of the subject areas described in Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Subpoena and is ordered to appear for deposition at Veritext Legal Solutions by 8/12/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall file a notice with the Court no later than August 15, 2016 stating whether Worldwide Mobile Trading has complied with this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court serve this Amended Order on the persons listed in order by email and U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that third party Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. shall pay Sprint's attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $28,818.51. The Court finds Worldwide Mobile Trading and its principal and owner, Chetan Arora, jointly and severally liable for this amount and directs them to pay counsel for Sprint by July 29, 2016.FURTHER ORDERED that Worldwide Mobile Trading shall produce by July 29, 2016 all documents responsive to Plaintiffs' request for documents as set forth in Exhibit B to the Subpoena to Plaintiffs' counsel.FURTHER ORDERED that Worldwide Mobile Trading shall designate one or more officers, directors, managing agents or other persons knowledgeable of the subject areas described in Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Subpoena and is ordered to appear for deposition at Veritext Legal Solutions, Sahara Rancho Office Center, 2250 S. Rancho Drive, Suite 195, Las Vegas, NV 89102 at a date and time agreeable to Plaintiffs counsel, but in any event no later than August 12, 2016. Worldwide Mobile Trading must contact Plaintiffs' counsel no later than July 22, 2016 to confirm its attendance at the deposition. If Worldwide Mobile Trading fails to confirm its attendance by July 22, 2016, Plaintiffs are ordered to notify the Court regarding Worldwide Mobile Tradings failure and the Court will issue appropriate sanctions.FURTHER ORDERED that if Worldwide Mobile Trading and Chetan Arora fail to comply with the obligations contained in this Order, they shall be subject to further sanctions from this Court, which may include additional monetary penalties accruing for each day of noncompliance and, if the noncompliance is shown to be willful, may include the issuance of an arrest warrant for Mr. Arora until he takes action to purge the contempt identified in this Court's previous orders.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a notice with the Court no later than August 15, 2016 stating whether Worldwide Mobile Trading has complied with this Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the #32 Report and Recommendation regarding Order to Show Cause is Accepted and Adopted in full: (1) Digitek Telecom, (2) Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., (3) World Mobile Co., (4) Ali Sadaqa Trading LLC, (5) J2 International Ltd., and (6) New Way International Ltd. are held in civil contempt.(1) Digitek Telecom, (2) Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., (3) World Mobile Co., (4) Ali Sadaqa Trading LLC, (5) J2 International Ltd., and (6) New Way International Ltd. shall pay Sprint's reasonable attorney's fees and costs in an amount to be determined by Richard F. Judge Boulware, II. Sprint shall have until 7/14/2016 to file a motion specifying the amount of attorney's fees and costs it seeks. Rampal Cellular Stockmarket (RCS) is not held in civil contempt at this time. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve copies of this Order on the third parties listed by U.S. Mail (see Order for addresses). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 9, 2016 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #32 Report and Recommendation addressed to Worldwide Mobile Co. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
April 14, 2016 Filing 33 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #32 Report and Recommendation addressed to Ali Sadaqa Trading. Envelope marked - Unable to Forward - Return to Sender. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (MAJ)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #20 Order to Show Cause. IT IS RECOMMENDED that: (1) Digitek Telecom, (2) Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., (3) World Mobile Co., (4) Ali Sadaqa Trading LLC, (5) J2 International Ltd., and (6) New Way International Ltd. be held in CIVIL CONTEMPT.IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that: (1) Digitek Telecom, (2) Sol Mobiles Pvt. Ltd., (3) World Mobile Co., (4) Ali Sadaqa Trading LLC, (5) J2 International Ltd., and (6) New Way International Ltd. pay Sprint's reasonable attorney's fees and costs in an amount to be determined by the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, U.S. District Judge, by a date to be determined.IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Rampal Cellular Stockmarket (RCS) not be held in civil contempt at this time.The Clerk of Court shall serve this Report & Recommendation on the third parties listed by U.S. Mail (see Order for details). Objections to R&R due by 3/27/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2015 Filing 31 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Order addressed to Moshe Alezra. Envelope marked - Unable to Forward - Return to Sender. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (NEV)
October 22, 2015 Filing 30 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2015 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Gail Podolsky, Esq., Appearing Telephonically; Def Counsel: None Appearing; Court Reporter/FTR #: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 2:10 -2:26 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Plaintiff's Counsel Gail Podolsky, Esq., appearing telephonically; no appearance is made on behalf of the defense. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of counsel regarding #10 Motion for Attorney Fees. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that the #10 Motion for Attorney Fees is GRANTED with respect to World Wild Mobile Trading. The Court directs that Ms. Podolsky submit a proposed order in word format to the Court due by October 26, 2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 8, 2015 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 10/8/2015. IT IS ORDERED, good cause appearing, that Plaintiffs' #28 Motion to appear telephonically at the October 22, 2015 hearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Attorney Gail Podolsky is instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4925, access code: 123456, 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 6, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. For Hearing Scheduled for October 22, 2015 Attorney: Gail Podolsky. by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Podolsky, Gail)
October 5, 2015 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 10/5/2015. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding re: #10 MOTION for Attorney Fees is set for October 22, 2015 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 17, 2015 Filing 26 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Order addressed to Al Sadaqa Trading, LLC. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
July 31, 2015 Filing 25 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Order addressed to Moshe Alezra. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
July 8, 2015 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
July 2, 2015 Filing 23 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 7/2/2015 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Gail Podolsky; Court Reporter/FTR #: 3:04 - 3:12; Time of Hearing: 3:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 3D; The court canvasses and hears representations from Ms. Podolsky. The court will issue a separate order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
June 26, 2015 Filing 22 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #20 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
June 18, 2015 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #16 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' #11 Motion to Compel. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/2/2015 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Any written response to this Order to show because must be filed by 6/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - persons served by email and U.S. Mail as directed in Order - SLD)
June 8, 2015 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #16 Order addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. No new address. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
June 5, 2015 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #16 Order addressed to Moshe Alezra. Envelope marked - Unable to Forward - Return to Sender. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
June 4, 2015 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #16 Order on Report and Recommendation, addressed to Worldwide Mobile Training, Inc. Address unknown, unable to remail. (TR)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Accepting and Adopting in full Magistrate Judge's #9 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that Worldwide Mobile Trading is found to be in Civil Contempt. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - persons served by email and U.S. Mail-see #9 for addresses - SLD)
May 11, 2015 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Report and Recommendation addressed to Moshe Alezra. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
May 5, 2015 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Report and Recommendation,, addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Address unknown, unable to remail. (DKJ)
April 29, 2015 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #9 Report and Recommendation addressed to Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. Envelope marked: Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed. No new address available. Clerk did not resend. (SLD)
April 28, 2015 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gail Podolsky re #11 Motion to Compel ; by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit)(Podolsky, Gail)
April 28, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel re: Discovery; filed by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Responses due by 5/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Podolsky, Gail)
April 28, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees; filed by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Responses due by 5/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Podolsky, Gail)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re the Court's #7 Order to Show Cause. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Worldwide Mobile Trading be held in Civil Contempt. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Worldwide Mobile Trading pay Sprint's reasonable attorney's fees and costs in an amount to be determined by the Honorable Richard F. Boulware by a date to be determined. Objections to R&R due by 5/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - persons served by email and U.S. Mail-see document for addresses - SLD)
April 16, 2015 Filing 8 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 4/16/2015 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Gail Podolsky; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:05 - 2:20; Time of Hearing: 2:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 3D; The court canvasses and hears representations from counsel. The court will issue a separate order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #1 Motion to Compel Third-Party Worldwide Mobile Trading, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/16/2015 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Show Cause Response due by 4/3/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - copies emailed/mailed to parties listed on Certificate of Service #1 -1 at 14 and 15; #6 - SLD)
February 24, 2015 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Declaration,, by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Podolsky, Gail)
February 23, 2015 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Gail Podolsky re #1 MOTION to Compel ; filed by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 7, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 7, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3 of 7, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4 of 7, #5 Exhibit 1 - Part 5 of 7, #6 Exhibit 1 - Part 6 of 7, #7 Exhibit 1 - Part 7 of 7, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9)(Podolsky, Gail)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gail E. Podolsky and approving Attorney Carlos Blumberg as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/20/2015. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 15, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case, formerly Misc. Case No. 2:14-ms-00082, having become a contested proceeding on 12/15/2014 this action has been converted to the regular civil docket and has been assigned case number 2:14-cv-2119-RFB-VCF. All future pleadings must be filed in the civil action and must bear said civil case number. (SLR)
December 15, 2014 Filing 2 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gail E. Podolsky and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Carlos Blumberg (Filing fee $ 200) by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Motion ripe 12/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Receipt #031050)(SLR)
December 15, 2014 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Nextel Corporation. Responses due by 1/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Receipt #031051)(SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Nextel Corporation et al v. Ace Wholesale, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Carlos Blumberg
Represented By: Gail E. Podolsky
Represented By: Michael S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company, L.P.
Represented By: Jarrod L. Rickard
Represented By: Carlos Blumberg
Represented By: Gail E. Podolsky
Represented By: Michael S. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Wholesale, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Floarea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Mandreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick Lanore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Archie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Genel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coptrade, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moshe Alezra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?