Brady v. Southwest Airlines Co. et al
Plaintiff: |
Chelcee Brady |
Defendant: |
B/E Aerospace Aircraft, Davis Aircraft Products Co and Southwest Airlines Co. |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02139 |
Filed: |
December 16, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER Granting 96 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Southwest Airlines Co. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
89
ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation Dismissing Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Numbers Three and Four Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing
70
ORDER that the status hearing on March 22, 2016, at 9:30 a.m., is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER that 43 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdicton is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant B/E Aerospace is hereby DISMISSED from the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 5, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER Granting Defendant B/E Aerospace Aircraft's 46 Motion to Stay Discovery. Once the 43 Motion for Judgment is decided the remaining parties shall file a joint proposed discovery plan within seven days of the issuance of the order resolving that motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER that the 48 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is Denied and discovery in this matter is STAYED until such time as the Court resolves the pending 46 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 7, 2015 |
Filing
41
ORDER Denying Defendant Davis Aircraft Products Co.'s 22 Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties shall file a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by 7/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing
39
ORDER that defendants motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, 14 , be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Defendant Davis Aircraft Products is hereby DISMISSED from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, 14 , be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?