McSwiggin et al v. Omni Limousine
Plaintiff: Christy McSwiggin and Kevin McSwiggin
Defendant: Omni Limousine
Case Number: 2:2014cv02172
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 107 Stipulation; Re: 102 Motion to Enforce, Responses due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Stipulation; Re: 102 Motion to Enforce, Responses due by 1/21/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Stipulation; Re: 102 Motion to Enforce, Responses due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion Approving Settlement of Plaintiff's FLSA Claims. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying 35 Motion to Certify Class.; denying 36 Motion.; denying 68 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the untimely joinders (ECF Nos. 39 , 50 , 61 ) be, and the same hereby are, STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying without prejudice 64 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying Defendant's 42 Motion to Strike the Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness without prejudice as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 07/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to exceed page limit on opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification; granting 51 Motion to exceed page limit on reply in support of motion for decertification; and Granting 52 Motion for leave to file excess pages on reply in support of motion for class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation to Extend the Parties' Respective Deadlines to File Replies in Support of 35 MOTION to Certify Class and 36 MOTION for Decertification (Second Request). Replies due by 5/23/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 25 Ex Parte Motion Without Prejudice. Plaintiffs shall properly file the motion without an ex parte designation if they continue to seek the relief requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulated Notice, Consent to Join and FLSA Notice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Anthony L. Hall substituted in place of James S. Kent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McSwiggin et al v. Omni Limousine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy McSwiggin
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McSwiggin
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omni Limousine
Represented By: James S Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?