Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. U.S. Home Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Defendant: Lennar Corporation, Lennar Sales Corp. and U.S. Home Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2017 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 254 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 7, 2017 263 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 237 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Champion Drywall Inc. of Nevada. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 16, 2017 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 232 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Pioneer Plumbing, Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 19, 2017 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 194 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; filed by ThirdParty Defendant Merillat Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 20, 2017 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 164 Motion to Dismiss. Claims against Cooper Roofing Co. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 24, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 139 Proposed Order Submission. Atrium Door and Window Company of Arizona terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 29, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 37 STIPULATION and Lifting Stay re 7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 31, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant U.S. Home Corporation's 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 03/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 7, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/17/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 1, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting New Hearing re 5 , 7 , 13 , 24 , and 25 Motions. Motion Hearing reset for 5/5/2015 at 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 31, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Responses due by 4/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. U.S. Home Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Represented By: Scott P Kelsey
Represented By: Anna Mirijanian
Represented By: Paul P. Terry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Sales Corp.
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?