Weathers v. Clark County Detention Center Faculty/Agency et al
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Weathers
Defendant: MD Lucius Blanchard, Clark County Detention Center Faculty/Agency, Las Vegas Skin and Cancer Clinic, S. Loumakis, Sgt. Adams and M. Suey
Case Number: 2:2015cv00027
Filed: January 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion; Mr. Weathers must comply with all procedural rules and court orders unless and until the Pro Bono Program finds pro bono counsel willing to take this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: 53 , 54 to P - JM)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 40 Motion to Compel.; denying 42 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Pro Bono Liaison - JM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ; denying 23 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS ACTIONS FILED BY INCARCERATED PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Scheduling Order is Granted. Discovery due by 6/22/2016. Motions due by 7/7/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 03/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weathers v. Clark County Detention Center Faculty/Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Lucius Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center Faculty/Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Skin and Cancer Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Loumakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Suey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?