Skylights LLC v. Byron et al
Plaintiff: |
Skylights LLC |
Defendant: |
David Byron, Jennifer Byron, CCSF LLC, CitiMortgage, Inc., Clear Recon Corp and Federal National Mortgage Association |
Counter Claimant: |
Federal Housing Finance Agency and Federal National Mortgage Association |
Intervenor: |
Federal Housing Finance Agency |
Counter Defendant: |
Skylights LLC and The Falls at Rhodes Ranch Owners Association, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00043 |
Filed: |
January 8, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Gloria M. Navarro |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation Seeking a Final Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Judgment issued on 6/24/15, 49 , be amended to reflect that it is a final judgment that resolves all claims and counterclaims in this case in favor of Fannie Mae and FHFA. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
58
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Fannie Mae and FHFAs 52 Motion to Amend Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 49 Judgment issued on June 24, 2015, be amended, see Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Fannie M ae file a report no later than 9/4/15, detailing the status of its quiet title counterclaim and indicating whether further discovery is warranted. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
June 24, 2015 |
Filing
48
ORDER Granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Fannie Mae, Clear Recon, FHFA, CCSF, CitiMortgage, and the Byrons are granted summary judgment on Skylightss claims for quiet title. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
May 27, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER Granting 39 Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2015 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro re 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay Discovery. In the event resolution of the above motion for summary judgment 26 does not result in the disposition of this case, the parties must file a joint discovery plan within 14 days of the issuance of the order resolving that motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 23, 2015 |
Filing
12
ORDER granting 11 Stipulation permitting Federal Housing Finance Agency to Intervene. This order is effective immediately. The Federal Housing Finance Agency must file its answer on or before January 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?