Searcy v. Esurance Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rosalind Searcy
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00047
Filed: January 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 123 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/22/2018.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying 104 Motion in Limine; ORDER granting 110 Motion in Limine; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 96 Proposed Pretrial Order is REJECTED. The parties shall submit a proposed joint pretrial order that complies with Local Rules 16-3 and 16-4 by 6/23/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Fifth Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant Esurance Insurance Company's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Directing the Parties to File Supplemental Briefs. Supplemental Briefs due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Sanctions and Denying Defendant's 78 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Gary Fye. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 08/01/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER declining expedited briefing and resolution re ECF No. 66 Motion for Sanctions. Motion will be briefed according to the default briefing schedule provided by the local rules, and the motion will be resolved by the Court in the ordinary course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Defendant's 59 Emergency Motion for Leave to Notice Second Deposition of Plaintiff. The hearing on the 59 motion scheduled for 03/14/2016 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe has been Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Emergency Motion. The Court hereby orders that any response must be filed no later than 03/03/2016, and any reply must be filed no later than 03/08/2016. The Court further sets a hearing on the motion for 11:00 a.m. on 03/14/2016, in Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. The 54 Notice of Deposition shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. The Court ORDERS the parties and counsel to cease filing discovery documents on the docket as required by Local Rule 26-8. Failure to abide by this order and Local Rule 26-8 may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Esurance Insurance Company's 29 Motion for Protective Order and Granting 45 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Denying without Prejudice 29 Motion for Protective Order and 32 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 19 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Rosalind Searcy. Discovery Plan due by 4/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searcy v. Esurance Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esurance Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Represented By: Conor P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalind Searcy
Represented By: James J Ream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?