Wright v. Jacob Transportation Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Wright
Defendant: Jacob Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00056
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: Jacob Transportation's motion for summary judgment on Wright's second claim for relief 78 is GRANTED and Jacob Transportation's motion to strike 81 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties have until April 15 , 2019, to file a stipulation of dismissal for the withdrawing plaintiffs that complies with FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that 74 and 75 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney are GRANTED. Mario P. Lovato withdrawn from the case. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to remove Mr. Lovato as counsel of record in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that the parties shall file, no later than January 5, 2018, a joint status report explaining the current status of this case and providing a schedule to move this case forward to completion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to plaintiffs; first claim pleading violations of the FLSA's minimum-wage provisions and Wright's third claim pleading violations of NRS 608.016 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' request under FRCP 56(d) to deny or delay considering Jacob Transportation's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Conditionally Certifying FLSA Claims as a Collective Action, Appointing Interim Class Counsel, and Striking Affirmative Defenses. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 13 Motion to Certify Class is GRANTED. Request for Approval of the proposed class n otice 13 -1, however, is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the law firms of Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Schulman & Rabkin, LLP; Johnson Becker PLLC; and Sommers Schwartz PC are appointed as interim class counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t 16 Motion to Strike is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Affirmative defenses #15, 40, 41, and 59 are STRICKEN from 12 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Stay Discovery/Submission of Discovery Schedule. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 24 Joint Notice of Proposed Discovery Plan and Order is denied, without prejudice. An appropriate motion to stay discovery or a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order shall be filed on or before April 3, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Jacob Transportation Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Burak S Ahmed
Represented By: Lynn M. Hansen
Represented By: James J. Jimmerson
Represented By: Mario P. Lovato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Wright
Represented By: David H. Grounds
Represented By: Jacob R Rusch
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Represented By: Jason J Thompson
Represented By: Jesse L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?