Gorum v. Calderwood
Plaintiff: Antoine Gorum
Defendant: Calderwood
Case Number: 2:2015cv00065
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER that 65 Motion to Extend Time to File Dispositive Motion is GRANTED. Motion due by 7/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner, as well as t he document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis for nonprisoners; or (2) pay the full filing fee of $400. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to reschedule the mediation 51 is granted. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Extend Time. Status Report due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendants' 38 Motion to Vacate and Reset Early Mediation Conference. An order setting a new date and time for the early mediation conference will be forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 09/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay is extended until five (5) days after the date of mediation. The status report regarding the results of the mediation shall be filed that same day. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Attorney General's Office shall show cause within 7 days of the entry of this order why it has not complied with 27 screening order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Motion Concerning Court's Order for Attorney General To Enter a Limited Notice of Appearance is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 21 Motion to Reopen Case is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall vacate 20 Clerk's Judgment and reopen this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 23 Motion for TRO are denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall docket 16 at 4-21 Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that 14 , 16 , 17 , and 18 Motions are denied as moot. It is further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiff's account in the months that the account exceeds $10.00, until the full $350 filing fee has been paid for this action. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy o f this Order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. The Clerk shall also send a copy of this Order to the attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections, P.O. Box 7011, Carson City, NV 89702. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint be dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: 1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis; 2) file a partial application with an accompanying penalty of perjury statement; or 3) pay the filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint, but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorum v. Calderwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calderwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Gorum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?