Okpoti v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Nathan Okpoti |
Defendant: |
Officer John D. Brandon and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00110 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER Granting 80 , 81 & 82 Defandants' Motions for Summary Judgment. The clerk of the court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants on all of Okpoti's claims. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that on or before 2/24/17, plaintiff Nathan Okpoti shall submit to chambers for inspection the version of the booking photo depicted at 86 -1 at 2, that he hopes to show to the jury. If Okpoti does not do so, I will resolve the summary judgment motions based on the evidence provided. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 28, 2016 |
Filing
84
ORDER Granting 83 Stipulation re 80 , 81 and 82 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/15/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 16, 2016 |
Filing
77
ORDER Granting 76 Stipulation to Redact Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 22, 2016 |
Filing
71
ORDER DENYING without prejudice # 70 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
69
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 47 and 55 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 57 Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 58 Motion for Continuance is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
60
ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re 47 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgement;. Replies due by 9/30/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
52
ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation to Extend Deadline re 47 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgement. Responses due by 9/17/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
44
ORDER Granting 43 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 28 Amended Complaint. City of Las Vegas answer due 8/17/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
27
ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Dates. Discovery due by 11/17/2015. Motions due by 12/17/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/2/2015) (DC).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?