LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden v. Gelgotas et al
Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden
Defendant: Citrus Gardens Homeowners Association, Federal National Mortgage Association, Marcelle Gelgotas, Principal Residential Mortgage, Inc., Mark Rock and Michelle Rock
Unknown: Gregory P Kerr
Intervenor: Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator of the Federal National Mortgage Association
Counter Claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Counter Defendant: Green Valley Ranch Community Association, Inc. and LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden
Case Number: 2:2015cv00112
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER remanding case; setting aside ECF No. 68 Order dismissing certain defendants; denying as moot ECF No. 95 Motion to Set Aside Order of Dismissal; directing Clerk to close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/24/2017. (Certified copies of this order and the docket sheet mailed to Eighth Judicial.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER approving ECF No. 90 Stipulation. Attorneys Ariel E. Stern and Tenesa S. Scaturro substituted as counsel of record for Federal National Mortgage Association in place and stead of Wolfe & Wyman LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CERTIFICATION ORDER, directing Clerk to serve a copy of this order on the NV AG (mailed 8/25/2016). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER staying case pending the Ninth Circuit's issuance of the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Defendant Fannie Mae and Intervenor FHFA's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Dismiss Counterdefendant Green Valley Ranch Community Association. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/15/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 5/13/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 4/28/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 27 Counterclaim, and 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 4/28/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: The Parties Shall File a Joint Discovery Plan Within Seven Days of the Issuance of the Order Resolving the Motion for Summary Judgment if Necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to Entry of Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden v. Gelgotas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citrus Gardens Homeowners Association
Represented By: Andre Valentim Farinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jarad D Beckman
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelle Gelgotas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Principal Residential Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gregory P Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Federal Housing Finance Agency as Conservator of the Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Leslie Bryan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jarad D Beckman
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Jennifer L. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Green Valley Ranch Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LN Management LLC Series 2543 Citrus Garden
Represented By: Kerry P. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?