U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Emerald Ridge Landscape Maintenance Association et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Emerald Ridge Landscape Maintenance Association and SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00117
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 61 Counter-claimant SFR's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 62 Motion for Summary Judgment, 66 SFR's Motion for Reconsideration and Defendant HOA's Joinder ECF No. 69 ; Clerk is instruc ted to enter judgment in favor of U.S. Bank on both its quiet titleclaim and SFRs quiet title counter-claim and to close this case as resolution of the parties quiet title claims render their other claims moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER LIFTING STAY. The temporary stay is lifted. The parties may file motions addressing the issues upon which the Court deferred ruling within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying Defendant Emerald Ridge Landscape Association's 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant Emerald Ridge Landscape Maintenance Association to File Its Opposition to Plaintiff U.S. Bank's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/12/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to respond to 19 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/22/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, N.A. v. Emerald Ridge Landscape Maintenance Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerald Ridge Landscape Maintenance Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?