Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Plaintiff: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and University of Strathclyde
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00139
Filed: January 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 02:431 Fed. Election Commission: Failure Enforce C
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Amneal that claims 1 and 2 of the '829 patent are invalid, and claims 3, 4, and 5-14 of the ' 829 patent are not infringed by ANDA No. 207547 as if fully tried and adjudicated.. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting as Amended 26 Joint Motion to Stay Action. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report every 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 1 Complaint. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC answer due 5/15/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: James W. Bradshaw
Represented By: William B. Coblentz
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Represented By: Aaron S. Lukas
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Thomas I Ross
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University of Strathclyde
Represented By: Amanda K Antons
Represented By: Mark H Izraelewicz
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Thomas I Ross
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?