Aevoe Corp. v. i-Blason LLC
Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
Defendant: i-Blason LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00149
Filed: January 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CONSENT JUDGMENT and PERMANENT INJUNCTION. All claims asserted between the parties in this litigation are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. This Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this ConsentJudgment, Injunction, and the confidential Settlement Agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 109 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Third Stipulation for Extension of Time re Discovery Deadlines which modifies only the claim construction briefing schedule. All other dates remain the same (see Order for deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER re 89 Status Report. The stay of this case is lifted. The parties must file an amended discovery plan and scheduling order for the court's consideration or a joint status report informing the court that an amended discovery plan and scheduling order is not necessary by 8/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that Defendant's 68 Motion to Stay Litigation is Granted in Part. The parties shall file a joint status report within five days of the issuance of the PTAB's decision on whether to institute an inter partes review, informing the Court of the PTAB's decision. Defendant's 70 Motion to Expedite is Denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CONSENT ORDER for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall strike Defendant's 46 Notice Regarding Discovery from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aevoe Corp. v. i-Blason LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i-Blason LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?