Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC and White Horse Estates Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00218
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 68 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion for order expunging U.S. Banks Lis Pendens is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion for summary judgment as against MAT and Meridias is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 U.S. Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant/Counter-claimant/Cross-claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and against all other parties. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay in this action is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that stipulations, motions to modify the discovery plan and scheduling order, or in the absence of such stipulations or motions, dispositive motions are due within forty-five (45) days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 61 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sean L. Anderson and Ryan D. Hastings for White Horse Estates Homeowners Association substituted for Attorney Steven T. Loizzi, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED that the motions for entry of clerk's default (ECF No. 30 / 31 ) are GRANTED; Clerk shall enter default as to Meridias Capital, Inc. and MAT Holdings, LLC; Counter-claimant/Cross-claimant is hereby ordered to file its motion for default judgment by 12/17/2016. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The undersigned is satisfied that there is complete diversity in this case and DISCHARGES the order to show cause with respect to jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. The Court will afford SFR one further opportunity to make a proper showing regarding its citizenship. This declaration shall be filed no later than 5/3/16. As previously ordered, all parties are further ordered to show cause in writing, no later than 5/11/16, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (See order for additional details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. SFR Investments Pool I, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Horse Estates Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?