Sinanyan et al v. Luxury Suites International, LLC et al

Plaintiff: James Koury, Alice Sinanyan and Sehak Tuna
Defendant: JetLiving Hotels, LLC, Luxury Suites International, LLC and Re/Max Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00225
Filed: February 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Alice Sinanyan against Defendants. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 122 Motion for Attorney Fees; ORDER granting 125 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 114 the parties' Motion for an Order is GRANTED. A final fairness hearing shall take place on 1/19/2018, at 9:00 am in Courtroom 7C before Chief Judge Gloria Navarro. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 96 the Report and Recommendation, is ACCEPTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Defendant's Answer, is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk enter default against Defendant pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying 88 Renewed Motion for an Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re 103 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending deadlines relating to Plaintiffs and Defendant Luxury Suites International, LLC ("LSI") are stayed pending mediation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Status Report is due by 9/19/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Stipulation re 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/25/2016. Replies due by 8/9/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Plaintiff Sehak Tuna. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 69 Motion for Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 65 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER re 59 Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2016 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Responses due by 1/26/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer re 32 Amended Complaint. Luxury Suites International, LLC answer due 12/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Motion for Leave to File Its Amended Answer to the First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 11/24/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinanyan et al v. Luxury Suites International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JetLiving Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Legolvan
Represented By: Craig J. Mariam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Suites International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Koury
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Royi Moas
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Sinanyan
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Royi Moas
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sehak Tuna
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Royi Moas
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?