Cantrell et al v. Capitol One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Freddie Cantrell, Jr. and June M. Cantrell
Defendant: Bank of America, Capitol One, N.A., Countrywide Bank, Ing Bank, Quality Loan Service Corp. and Recontrust Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00257
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Plaintiffs' claims for civil conspiracy, TILA claim for damages, fraudulent appraisal, and breach of fiduciary duty are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. The following claims are dismissed with prejudice: (1) TILA claim for rescission; (2) predatory lending practices; and (3) FDCPA violations. Additionally, the follow ing claims are dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend: (1) civil conspiracy; (2) TILA claim for damages; (3) fraudulent appraisal; and (4) breach of fiduciary duty. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint by 03/28/2016. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date shall result in the Court dismissing these claims with prejudice and closing the case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Emergency Hearing is Denied. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' 25 Motion to Strike is Denied in part and Granted in part. The motion is Denied as moot as to Plaintiffs' 13 Motion for Hearing, and GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' 14 Response to Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall Strike Plaintiffs' 14 Response. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 03/07/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that the action is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to defendant ING Bank. ING Bank terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell et al v. Capitol One, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol One, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ing Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddie Cantrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June M. Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?