Guild Mortgage Company v Prestwick Court Trust, et al
Plaintiff: Guild Mortgage Company
Defendant: Canyon Crest Master Association and Prestwick Court Trust
Case Number: 2:2015cv00258
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 70 Prestwick's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 74 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 76 Guild's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulation to Extend Time re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due by 9/15/2017.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline. (Motions due by 9/15/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven T. Loizzi, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Rock K. Jung terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment 14 , 32 , be, and the same hereby are, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 35 , be and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide notice to the Nevada attorney general in compliance with FRCP 5.1, and include proof of such notice upon filing any further motions raising co nstitutional challenges.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court certifies to the Nevada attorney general that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The attorney general shall have 30 days with in which to intervene on behalf of the State of Nevada for presentation of argument on the question of the constitutionality of the statute.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guild Mortgage Company v Prestwick Court Trust, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Crest Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestwick Court Trust
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guild Mortgage Company
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?