Nevada Power Company v. Trench France SAS et al
Plaintiff: |
Nevada Power Company |
Defendant: |
Siemens AG Osterreich and Trench France SAS |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00264 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Prop. Damage Prod. Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER Granting Defendant Siemens AG Osterreich's 44 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff Nevada Power Company's 1 Complaint is Dismissed without prejudice. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting Defendant Siemens AG Osterreich's 45 Motion to Stay Discovery and Denying as moot Siemens' request for an order shortening time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting Defendant Trench France SAS' 15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Trench France is DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant Trench France SAS' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted is DENIED as Moot without prejudice. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/02/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
June 24, 2015 |
Filing
35
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 33 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 12, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) Modified on 6/12/2015 (AC).
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Motion for leave to conduct jurisdictional discovery. The Court expects the parties to comply with the current deadlines for the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) conference and the submission of the stipulated discovery plan and proposed scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?