Mendez v. Fiesta Del Norte Home Owners Association et al
Plaintiff: Irma Mendez
Defendant: Absolute Business Solutions, Inc., Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Complete Management Company, LLC, Fiesta Del Norte Home Owners Association and Amir Hujjuttallah
Case Number: 2:2015cv00314
Filed: February 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting ECF No. 215 Stipulation to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 209 Motion for Trial Setting; setting Status Conference for 7/9/2018 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones; directing the parties to bring their calendars and be prepared to set this matter for trial. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDERED that the Motions for Attorney's Fees (ECF Nos. 200 , 201 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference is set for 4/9/2018 at 11:30 A.M. in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Joint Status Report and Out-of-state counsel's Request to Appear Telephonically due on or before due by 5:00 P.M., on 3/30/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 3/14/2018 to correct typo (KW).
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER that ECF No. 185 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and ECF No. 192 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDERED that cases 2:15-cv-1325-JCM-CWH and 2:16-cv-1077-APGNJK are TRANSFERRED to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings, and all further filings in those cases shall bear the captions 2:15-cv -1325-RCJ-NJK and 2:16-cv-1077-RCJ-NJK, respectively. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file copies of this Order into the dockets of cases 2:15-cv-1325-JCM-CWH and 2:16-cv-1077-APG-NJK. Signed by Judges Robert C. Jones, James C. Mahan, and Andrew P. Gordon on 7/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 160 Motion to Extend Time : Joint Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 157 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan is hereby Denied without prejudice. The parties must file a new joint proposed discovery plan that complies in full with LR 26-1, no later than June 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER directing Interested Party JimiJack Irrevocable Trust to file a Certificate of Interested parties by 4:00 p.m. 5/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 114 Motion for Reconsideration; granting Plaintiff's request to extend discovery one day to encompass 3/4/2016 deposition of Michele Naomi; directing Defendant Hujjuttallah to appear at a deposition noticed by Plaintiff (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 109 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part 103 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff may file the proposed second amended complaint (to remove claim for declaratory judgment) within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 100 Fifth Motion for Issuance of Subpoena. The Clerk of Court shall issue a blank subpoena on form AO 88A and mail it to Plaintiff. To the extent Plaintiff requests any relief other than the issuance of a blank subpoena that request is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - subpoena mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that 97 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk of Court shall issue a blank subpoena on form AO 88A, and mail it to Plaintiff. To the extent Plaintiff requests any relief other than the issuance of a blank subpoena, that request is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Plaintiff's 90 Third Motion for Issuance of Subpoena is Granted to the extent that the Clerk of Court shall issue a blank supoena on form AO 88A and mail it to Plaintiff. To the extent Plaintiff requests any relief other than issuance of a blank subpoena that request is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - subpoena mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that the motion hearing re 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is continued to 12/17/2015 at 11:00 am in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Defendant Hujjuttallah and a corporate representative for Defendant Absolute Bu siness Solutions, Inc. are ORDERED to appear and to show cause why the Court should not sanction them. Defendants' current counsel and Defendants' newly retained counsel shall also appear in person at the hearing. No later than 12/4/2015 Defendants' current counsel of record shall serve Defendants with this order that they appear and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that Plaintiff's 83 Second Motion for Issuance of Subpoena is GRANTED to the extent that the Clerk of Court shall issue a blank subpoena on form AO 88A and mail it to Plaintiff. To the extent Plaintiff requests any relief other than the issuance of a blank subpoena that request is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - subpoena mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 67 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Discovery due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2015 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Any Responses due by 11/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 67 Motion to Extend Discovery Cutoff. Responses due by 11/12/2015. Replies due by 11/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 45 , 47 , and 55 Motions to Dismiss. The Court dismisses the claim under §1692d against Alessi & Koenig, the claim under § 1692f against CMC, the claim under § 1692g (c) against all Defendants, the fraud claim against all Defendants, and the breach of contract claim against CMC and Alessi & Koenig without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED ORDER that 14 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, with leave to amend in part. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that 11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, with leave to amend in part. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 5/21/2015 Plaintiff must provide certification that she has completed the CM/ECF tutorial and is familiar with Electronic Filing Procedures, Best Practices, and the Civil & Criminal Events Menu that are accessible on the court's website. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Any Responses due by 4/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2015 04:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel shall attend the hearin g. No later than 4/10/2015 Plaintiff's current counsel of record shall serve Plaintiff with this Order that she appear and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 4/13/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee accompanied by a copy of this order or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 4/10/2015. The case is Stayed until either the fee is paid or the Court grants the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Fiesta Del Norte Home Owners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiesta Del Norte Home Owners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Hujjuttallah
Represented By: Patrick W Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?