Gurshin v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Alexis Gurshin
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00323
Filed: February 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 218 Plaintiff's Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion is granted insofar as the Court reduces the costs taxed against Plaintiff to $5,000. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to eliminate all costs taxed. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 143 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 150 , 158] Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 173 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Evidence is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 144 , 159 , 165 , 181 , 189 the Motions to Seal are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 148 , 174 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 159 , 182 Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Late File are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying 132 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; denying 133 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Granting 202 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Samantha J. Swietlikowski withdrawn from the case Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the continued settlement conference scheduled for 5/30/17 is VACATED. The parties may file a stipulation or motion requesting the court to reschedule the continued settlement conference to a later date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case returns to the normal litigation track. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 106 Bank of America's motion to deem matters admitted is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Requests 91, 93, 95, 97, 99, 101, 103, 105, 107, 109, 111, 113, 115, 117, 119, 121, 123, 125, and 127 are deemed admitted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 117 Gurshin's motion to deem matters admitted is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Requests 23, 26, 27-29, 31-34, 36, 40, 41 61-63, 65, 74, and 78 are deemed admitted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [1 23] Gurshin's motion to extend time is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 120 Gurshin's motion to compel additional deposition time is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 118 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responses. Responses due 11/10/2016. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery Motions due by 11/14/2016., Replies due by 11/22/2016., Responses due by 11/15/2016. Discovery Motions addressing allegedly deficient responses due by 11/8/2016. Dispositive Motions and Joint Pretrial Order deadlines are Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Motion to Extend Time re 106 Motion to Compel re Discovery. Responses due by 11/8/2016. Replies due by 11/15/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Request for Discovery Conference. ( Discovery Hearing set for 9/27/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Clarifying 93 Minute Order. The 97 Motion to Amend/Correct is GRANTED to the extent that this order clarifies the meaning of the sentence at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation. Status conference reset for 7/26/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to file excerpts of exhibits 4 and 5 to her response to Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion for Protective Order Under Seal and Authentication Declaration 84 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension for Plaintiff to Late File Her Reply in Support of Her 52 Motion to Compel Discovery of Wu Records 77 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 70 Emergency Motion to Stay; staying the 4/27/2016 deposition of Geoffrey Baughman; directing Geoffrey D. Baughman Insurance to make reasonable efforts to locate all documents responsive to the Subpoena Duces Tecum but not produce them unless later ordered by the Court; scheduling a hearing for 5/18/2016 at 1:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 50 , 51 , 52 , 53 , 55 , 56 , 57 , 58 , and 63 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation for One day Extension for Plaintiff to File her Reply in support of 50 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Reply due 4/15/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Bank of America's Motion to Order Plaintiff Alexis Gurshin to Submit to a Mental Examination 39 is GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. Motion Hearing re 39 Motion to Compel set for 1/26/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 2/19/2016. Motions due by 3/21/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Stipulation for a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Amended Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/11/2015. Motions due by 12/11/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurshin v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Chad C. Butterfield
Represented By: Bethany Anne Pelliconi
Represented By: Lindsay L. Ryan
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Gurshin
Represented By: Kathleen J England
Represented By: Margaret A McLetchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?