Bruins v. Osborn et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Bruins and Robin Bruins
Defendant: Juan Arias, B.O. Estes, F. Herrera, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Naphcare, Inc., Dennis Osborn, A. Poehl and D. Slattery
Case Number: 2:2015cv00324
Filed: February 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Re: 101 Status Report indicating that this matter has been resolved in its entirety. The clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER that on or before 12/14/2018 the parties shall file a status report regarding what, if anything, remains of this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Defendants' 88 Motion to Stay Case. This case is stayed in its entirety until the Ninth Circuit rules upon the Defendants' appeal.The parties shall file a Status Report within 21 days after completion of the mediation or six months from entry of this Order whichever comes first. The 90 Joint Pretrial Order is rejected as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER that the 85 Response is deemed satisfied and an order to show cause regarding sanctions will not issue. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 69 Motion to Reconsider. See Order for deadline set for 3/30/2018 re action Defendants and their counsel shall address in writing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Re: Plaintiffs' 69 Motion for Reconsideration. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants Naphcare, Inc. and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply to 53 MOTION to Amend Complaint, Substitute Does. Plaintiffs' Replies due by 1/17/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 47 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruins v. Osborn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.O. Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Poehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Bruins
Represented By: Paola M. Armeni
Represented By: Colleen E McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Bruins
Represented By: Paola M. Armeni
Represented By: Colleen E McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?