O'Brien v. R.C. Willey Home Furnishings
Plaintiff: Steven O'Brien
702) 796-7181 (fax: R.C. Willey Home Furnishings
Case Number: 2:2015cv00329
Filed: February 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to stipulation of the parties (ECF No. 70 ) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice and on the merits. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Setting a Settlement Conference for 9/18/2019 in LV Chambers - Room 3099 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Plaintiff must report to Magistrate Judge Albregts's chambers at 9:30 AM. Defendants must report to Magistr ate Judge Albregts's chambers at 10:00 AM. The settlement conference statements shall be submitted to LV Chambers - Room 3099 no later than 4:00 PM on 9/11/2019. Do not serve a copy on opposing counsel. Do not deliver or mail copies to the clerk's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER approving ECF No. 57 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mitch M. Longson on behalf of Defendant R.C. Willey Home Furnishings and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lyssa S. Anderson. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/22/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Stipulation : Status Conference vacated and continued to Tuesday 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robert C. Jones. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report at least two weeks before the rescheduled Status Conference, which shall include three (3) mutually agreed upon dates by the parties for trial. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 6/5/2019 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. R.C. Willey Home Furnishings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven O'Brien
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 796-7181 (fax: R.C. Willey Home Furnishings
Represented By: Lyssa S Anderson
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Ryan W. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?