Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. v. QRS Music Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Thomas Dolan and QRS Music Technologies, Inc. |
Counter Claimant: |
Thomas Dolan and QRS Music Technologies, Inc. |
Counter Defendant: |
Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00333 |
Filed: |
February 26, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Recovery/Enforcement |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 7, 2018 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting ECF No 109 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
105
ORDER granting ECF No. 104 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to attorneys Matthew D Francis and Arthur A Zorio; Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. shall have until 7/5/2018 to advise the Court if it will retain new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
90
ORDER that QRS's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 57 / 58 isgranted in part and denied in part as follows:1. SMK's first cause of action is limited to damages caused by theincompleteness of the List discussed in paragraph 3 of the Agreement;2. The damages in SMK's second and third causes of action are limited to thevalue of the 44 pianos discussed above;3. Damages for SMK's seventh cause of action are limited to $43,680; and4. Summary ju dgment is granted in favor of QRS on SMK's fourth, fifth, eighth,eleventh and twelfth causes of action.QRS's Motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
November 3, 2016 |
Filing
79
ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 78 Renewed Motion to File its Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and to Reopen Discovery Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 21, 2016 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 50 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 26, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting 31 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. v. QRS Music Technologies, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: Thomas Dolan |
Represented By: |
Gabriel A. Blumberg |
Represented By: |
Jacob L. Fonnesbeck |
Represented By: |
Eric D. Hone |
Represented By: |
Walter A. Romney, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: QRS Music Technologies, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gabriel A. Blumberg |
Represented By: |
Jacob L. Fonnesbeck |
Represented By: |
Eric D. Hone |
Represented By: |
Walter A. Romney, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas Dolan |
Represented By: |
Gabriel A. Blumberg |
Represented By: |
Jacob L. Fonnesbeck |
Represented By: |
Eric D. Hone |
Represented By: |
Walter A. Romney, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: QRS Music Technologies, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Gabriel A. Blumberg |
Represented By: |
Jacob L. Fonnesbeck |
Represented By: |
Eric D. Hone |
Represented By: |
Walter A. Romney, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter defendant: Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. |
Represented By: |
Boyoon Choi |
Represented By: |
Matthew D Francis |
Represented By: |
Frank S. Homsher |
Represented By: |
Arthur A Zorio |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Samick Musical Instruments Co., Ltd. |
Represented By: |
Boyoon Choi |
Represented By: |
Matthew D Francis |
Represented By: |
Frank S. Homsher |
Represented By: |
Arthur A Zorio |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?