Geico Indemnity Company v. Goldstein
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant: Steven Goldstein
Case Number: 2:2015cv00340
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 83 GEICO Indemnity Company's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of GEICO and against defendant Steven Goldstein and plaintiff Carolyn Mann. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER. It is Hereby Ordered that Magistrate Judge Leen's Order 57 is affirmed in its entirety, and GEICO's Objection 58 is overruled. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED 15 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall comply with LR 10-5(b) and the Ninth Circuit's opinion in Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006), with respect to filing documents under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Indemnity Company v. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Matthew John Douglas
Represented By: Thomas E. Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?