Assurance Company of America et al v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Assurance Company of America and Northern Insurance Company Of New York
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00460
Filed: March 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying 55 Motion for Rule 60(b) Relief and 54 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 40 the defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED.The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiffs and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 20 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assurance Company of America et al v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assurance Company of America
Represented By: William C. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Insurance Company Of New York
Represented By: William C. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Morison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?