Ruth v. Mona et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ruth
Defendant: Bart P Mackay, Michael Mona, Jr. and Larry Raskin
Nominal Defendant: Cannavest Corp.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00481
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer due 1/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for 1:00 PM, 11/16/2020, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 3:00 PM, 12/21/2020. The status hearing will be held by video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to file and serve a response to the Complaint: 9/20/2019; Plaintiffs' deadline to file and serve any opposition to any motion filed in response to the Complai nt: 45 days after the filing of such motion; Defendants' deadline to file and serve any reply to Plaintiffs' opposition: 21 days after the filing of such opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 12/2/2019, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation re Stay of Action and Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re: 49 Joint Status Report. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint should be filed on or before thirty (30) days from the date this Stipulation is so ordered by the Court. The Defendants thereafter shall have thirty (30) days to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 Joint Status Report. Status Report due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 39 Status Report. Status Report due by 6/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruth v. Mona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Cannavest Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart P Mackay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mona, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ruth
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Represented By: Matthew L. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?