Smith v. Accredited Home Lenders, Inc et al
Plaintiff: |
Raymond Smith |
Defendant: |
Accredited Home Lenders and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00565 |
Filed: |
March 26, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. If plaintiff has not obtained default against Accredited and filed a proper motion for default judgment by 8/30/2017, this case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 4, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER Cancelling Lis Pendens. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Notice of Lis Pendens Affecting Real Property filed in this action on February 5, 2016, and recorded as Instrument Number 20160209-0000539 on February 9, 2016 13 is CANCELED, and Raymon d Smith is ORDERED to immediately record a copy of this Order Canceling Lis Pendens with the Clark County Recorder. This cancellation has the same effect as an expungement of the original notice. re 13 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Raymond Smith Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER that 14 Three Day Home Sales, LLC's Emergency Motion to Intervene under FRCP 24(a) for the limited purpose of seeking to cancel the lis pendens is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must appear before Hon. Judge Jennifer Dorsey i n Courtroom 6D of the Lloyd D. George Federal Courthouse at 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South on April 4, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., at which plaintiff must demonstrate through affidavits and other evidence the court may permit that he can satisfy the requireme nts in NRS 14.015 such that the lis pendens should not be cancelled. Plaintiff's failure to appear and provide that proof will result in the cancellation of the lis pendens (ECF 13 ) without further notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims against US Bank are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that proof or timely service on Accredited Home Lenders is due 7/10/15. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?