Allegiant Air, LLC v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al

Defendant: Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224, Corey Berger, Cameron Graff, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division and Gregory Jones
702) 471-7070 (fax: Allegiant Air, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00580
Filed: March 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading re 1 Complaint. Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224 and International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division answer due 5/21/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants to File First Responsive Pleading or Motion. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Amending Preliminary Injunction re 34 MOTION to Clarify or Modify Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff shall post a nominal bond of ten thousand dollars ($10,000) because the evidence indicates that Defendants will suffer only minimal, if any, damage by the issuance of this temporary restrainin g order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transfer Case No. 2:15-cv-00580-GMN-PAL, Allegiant Air, LLC v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al., to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon, United States Dis trict Judge, and the Honorable George W. Foley, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, and all future pleadings shall bear the following Case No.: 2:15-cv-00580-APG-GWF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until Monday, April 6, 20 15, to file their Response Brief to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 11 . Thereafter, Plaintiff shall have until Wednesday, April 8, 2015, to file their Reply Brief. The matter shall be set for hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Prelimin ary Injunction on Friday, April 10, 2015, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon, United States District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegiant Air, LLC v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Professionals Association of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No. 1224
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Berger
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Graff
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: James Petroff
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Jones
Represented By: Sean W. McDonald
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 471-7070 (fax: Allegiant Air, LLC
Represented By: Ross C Goodman
Represented By: Douglas Ward Hall
Represented By: Andrew Duncan McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?