Gamble v. Southern Desert Correctional et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Gamble
Defendant: Dr. Peter Derby, F. Dressen, Cheryl Dressler, Ben Guiterrez, SDCC Medical Staff, Southern Desert Correctional and Brian Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv00619
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Motions due by 4/15/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/17/2021 or 30 days after a decision on the dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Fourth Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/15/2020. Motions due by 1/15/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 99 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re Discovery 95 Order. Discovery due by 9/14/2020. Motions due by 10/14/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Re: 88 Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic hearing is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 8/9/19, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER that the Settlement Conference is rescheduled for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The confidential statement is due by 4:00 PM on 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for discovery under FRCP 56(d) is Granted and Defendants' 63 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied without prejudice to Defendants' ability to refile it after the close of discovery. Discovery is REOPENED and extended to 6/21/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Temporary Stay. Plaintiff's 61 Motion to Stay is Granted in part. All proceedings in this case are stayed until 6/1/2018 to allow the Pilot Pro Bono Program additional time to locate counsel for the Plaintiff. Plaint iff's opposition to Defendant's 63 Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to 6/22/2018. Defendants' 64 Motion to Seal Documents Exhibits E, F, and I in support of 63 Motion for Summary Judgment under seal is Granted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Leave to Begin Discovery.The discovery stay is LIFTED and the following discovery deadlines apply: Discovery due by 2/16/2018. Motions due by 3/19/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Clarification of Court's Existing Orders and 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery is stayed to allow Washoe Legal Services additional time to secure pro bono representation for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This case is referred to the Pilot Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel. The Clerk shall forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Mai Tieu - SLD)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Discovery. The following discovery deadlines apply: Discovery due by 9/18/2017. Motions due by 10/20/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Screening Complaint. Plaintiff is not required to pay an initial installment of the filing fee but remains responsible for paying the filing fee in full once he has the funds available. Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Amend is Granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately file pages 4-22 of ECF No. 30 as Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's E ighth Amendment deliberate-indifferenceto- serious-medical-needs claim may proceed against defendants Drs. Leaks, Sanchez, and Aranas; nurses Stacey, Tracey, Weiler, and Guitierrez; and defendants Williams and Dreesen only;Plaintiff's acces s-to-the-courts claim is Dismissed with prejudice because amendment would be futile; andAll claims against defendants Bannister, McDaniel, Foster, and Adams are Dismissed with prejudice because amendment would be futile. The Attorney General&# 039;s Office must file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re Defendants whom it does/does not accept service for by 10/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance and Chief of Inmate Services - SLD)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that a decision on Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Deferred.Plaintiff's claims against the State of Nevada are Dismissed with prejudice because amendment would be futile; Plaintiff& #039;s Eighth Amendment deliberate-indifference claim may proceed against Defendants Drs. Aranas and Sanchez and nurses Guitierrez, Weiler, Tracey, and Stacey only; and Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Drs. Leaks and Bannister, E.K. M cDaniel, Sheryl Foster, Brian Williams, Minor Adams, and Frank Dreesen are Dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend. Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is Granted Nunc Pro Tunc to 3/7/2016. Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 24 Motion for Docket Sheet/Case Summary are Denied. The Clerk is instructed to file Plaintiff's 17 -1 Amended Complaint. Second Amended Complaint deadline: 8/12/2016. If Plaintiff does not file a S econd Amended Complaint this case will proceed on the deliberate-indifference claim against Drs. Aranas and Sanchez and nurses Guitierrez, Weiler, Tracey, and Stacey only. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Complaint instructions/form and Amended Complaint mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall vacate the 16 Order and reinstate Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No filing fee is due and no funds should be withdrawn from Plaintif'fs account at th is time. The Court will rule on the application to proceed in forma pauperis at a later date. Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is Granted. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, this cas e shall proceed on the deliberate indifference claim against defendant Williams only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance, Chief of Inmate Services; Complaint instructions/form, 1 -1 Complaint, and 2 Screening Order mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), the Nevada Department of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court, District of Nevada, 20% of the preceding months deposits to Plaintiff's account (Clarence Gamble, # 1024656), in the months that the account exceeds $10.00, until the full $350.00 filing fee has been paid for this action. The Clerk of the Court shall SEND a copy o f this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office. The Clerk of the Court shall also SEND a copy of this order to the attention of the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Corrections. The Clerk of the Court shal l electronically SERVE a copy of this order and 3 Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Notice due within 21 days from the Attorney General advising the Court and Plaintiff of: (a) the names of the defendants for whom it accepts service; (b) the names of the defendants for whom it does not accept service, and (c) the names of the defendants for whom it is filing last- known-address information under seal. If the Attorney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), such defendant(s) shall file and serve an answer or other response to the complaint within 60 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that pursuant to the Court's 2 Screening Order this action shall proceed on the deliberate indifference to serious medical needs claim against Defendant Brian Williams. This action is STAYED for 90 days. If the case does not settle Pl aintiff will be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee. If Plaintiff is allowed to proceed in forma pauperis the fee will be paid in installments from his prison trust account. If Plaintiff is not allowed to proceed in forma pauperis the & #036;350.00 will be due immediately. The Attorney General's Office shall advise the Court within 21 days of the date of the entry of this Order whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendants for the purpose of settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order, Screening Order, and Complaint electronically sent to Attorney General - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Southern Desert Correctional et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Peter Derby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Dressen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Dressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Guiterrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDCC Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Desert Correctional
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?