Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Defendant: Mr. Anderson, Guard Lt. Bean, Mrs. Calderwood, Mr. Cox, Guard Lt. Day, Guard Sgt. Groove, Ms. Knight, Mr. Neven, Guard Palaloy, Guard Sgt. Palozzo, Guard Sgt. Portillo, Guard Lt. Provileral, Miss Salazar, Guard Sgt. Sanches, State of Nevada, Lewaine Steve, Inmate Reese Weldren, Guard White, Guard Wikoff and Guard S. Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv00623
Filed: April 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff Victor Tagle's claims against Manuel Portillo are DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with the Court's orders and the Local Rules. The clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendant Manuel Portillo and against plaintiff Victor Tagle. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 238 plaintiff Victor Tagle's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of the entry of this order, the remaining parties shall file a proposed joint pretrial order.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Granting 201 defendant Kyle Groover's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk of court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Groover on all Tagle's claims against him. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Denying 139 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 229 Plaintiff's Motion for Disclosure of Defendants is granted as discussed above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 230 Plaintiff's Motion for Docket Sheet is granted, in part, and denied, in part, as follow s: The Clerk's office shall provide Plaintiff with a printout of the docket sheet in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for default judgment to be entered on his behalf and his request for immediate release are denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 221 Plaintiff's Request for Authorities and Court's Intervention is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER Denying 208 Motion for Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 178 Defendants Kyle Groover and Manuel Portillo's Motion for Pretrial Conference to Caution Plaintiff and for Instructions to Defendants is granted, in part, and denied, in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 172 Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 169 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Response to Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED 170 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Cases is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 171 Defendants' Motion to Strike Affidavit and Notice is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 173 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint in Regard to Email is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 162 Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and 163 Motion for Copy Work Extension are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER that 190 Defendants Kyle Groover and Manuel Portillos Motion to Extend Time is granted. Defendants shall have until July 31, 2017 to file their motions for summary judgement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 159 Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Filings is granted. The Clerk's office shall send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet that shows the entries made from the last 90 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 140 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time Regarding Discovery is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 141 Motion for Court Intervention is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Stricken per Minute Order (ECF No. 145) ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall respond to 141 plaintiff Victor Tagle's request for court intervention on or before 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, 4/27/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 4/24/2017 (AF).
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Denying 132 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than 2/18/17 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 118 plaintiff Victor Tagle's motion for default judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 119 plaintiff Victor Tagle's motion for punishment of fraud is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 108 and 110 Motions to Strike. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiffs supplemental third amended complaint 86 on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Notice due within 21 days and Answer due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 93 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 04/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 43 Motion to Issue Summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 03/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 81 Motion for an Enlargement of Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 12/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 6 Motion to Intervene/Investigate; denying without prejudice 8 Motion to extend prison copywork limit; denying 9 Motion for suggestion of death; denying 10 Motion to be removed from NDOC's Jurisdiction; denying 11 Motion for transportation for personal appearance or, in the alternative, motion to appear telephonically or video conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. The Clerk of the Court shall send to Plaintiff the approved form for filing a &Sect 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his original complaint 1 -2. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, he must use the approved form and he shall write the words First Amended above the words Civil Rights Complaint in the caption. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff chooses not to file an amended complaint, this action shall proceed on his original filed complaint 1 -2. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc P as ordered DKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Lt. Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Calderwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cox
Represented By: Caroline Bateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Lt. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Sgt. Groove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Palaloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Sgt. Palozzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Sgt. Portillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Lt. Provileral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Sgt. Sanches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewaine Steve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Reese Weldren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Wikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?