Green Tree Servicing LLC v. SFR Investments Pool1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool1, LLC and Spring Mountain Ranch HOA
Case Number: 2:2015cv00630
Filed: April 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and against Jerry Bowser and Michelle Bowser as follows: It is hereby declared that the homeowners associations non-judicial foreclosure sale conducted on 11/8/2013 extinguished any interest Jerry Bowser and Michelle Bowser had in the property located at 8525 Brody Marsh Avenue in Las Vegas, Nevada. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER. I ORDER that 87 plaintiff Ditech Financial LLC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. I FURTHER ORDER that 81 , 93 defendant Spring Mountain Ranch Homeowners' Association's motions to dismiss and for summary judgment ar e GRANTED. I FURTHER ORDER that by 2/7/2020, cross-claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC must either move for default judgment or voluntarily dismiss its cross-claim against Jerry Bowser and Michelle Bowser. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties' motions for summary judgment 45 , 46 , and 48 are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15- 15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying 33 Motion To Amend and Granting Leave to File Renewed Motion To Amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before September 6, 2016, plaintiff Green Tree. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Spring Mountain Ranch Homeowners Associat ion may renew its motion to dismiss based on Nevada Revised Statutes § 38.310. If it chooses to do so, it must file its renewed motion within 15 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation re 45 , 46 , and 48 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/2/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the party challenging Chapter 116's constitutionality in each of these cases must serve the Nevada Attorney General with the complaint, motion, or other filing that calls into question Chapter 116's constitutionality, and shall file proof of compliance within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Motion to Withdraw and denying 24 and 26 Motions for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. Because 27 Subpoena Returned Executed was filed in violation of Local Rule 26-8, it shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. The Court ORDERS the parties and counsel to cease filing discovery documents on the docket as required by Local Rule 26-8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. SFR Investments Pool1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Mountain Ranch HOA
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?