Isaza v. Trotter et al
Plaintiff: |
Rigoberto Enrique Isaza |
Defendant: |
Farmers Insurance and Earl Marshal Trotter |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00632 |
Filed: |
April 7, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 7, 2016 |
Filing
31
AMENDED ORDER that 24 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED, Isaza's objections (ECF No. 28 ) are OVERRULED, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER that 24 Report and Recommendation is Adopted, Isaza's objections [ECF No. 29 ] are OVERRULED, and this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
April 15, 2016 |
Filing
27
ORDER denying 25 Motion for Appointment of the U.S. Marshal to Serve Defendant Earl Trotter. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
February 25, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 02/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
October 28, 2015 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
October 5, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER that 2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the NDOC shall pay to the Clerk of Court 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiff's account (inmate #1134484), in the months that the account exceeds $10.00, until the full $350 filing fee has been paid for this action. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until November 5, 2015 to file an amended complaint correcting the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc Finance; Chief of Inmate Services - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?