December 23, 2019 |
Filing
111
ORDER. To preserve judicial resources, the Court expresses its willingness to reconsider or vacate 99 its prior Order. If the Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit remands this case in light of this Order, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall hav e thirty days from the date of remand to file renewed dispositive motions.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 110 the Court's prior Order is now amended to conform with this Order.The Clerk of Court shall reopen the case and deliver a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Appeal Number 18-15583. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: COA - ADR)
|
December 18, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 99 the Court's prior Order is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file renewed dispositive motions. The Clerk of Court shall reopen the case and deliver a copy of this Order to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Appeal Number 18-15583. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: COA - ADR)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
99
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED 56 that BANA's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 82 BANA's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 , 83 , 84 SFR and HOA's Mo tions for Summary Judgment are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 SFR's Motion for Relief Under Rule 56(d) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 57 , 61 the Motions to Stay are DENIED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 21, 2018 |
Filing
95
ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 82 , 83 , 84 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/27/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 29, 2018 |
Filing
89
ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 82 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 83 , 84 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/5/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER Granting 70 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Brett M Coombs terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 5, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 46 Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/04/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
44
ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 6, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Ashlie L. Surur withdrawn and removed from the electronic service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 06/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
January 31, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Monterosso's Motion to Dismiss, 10 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, pursuant to the foregoing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that BANA's claims for breach of contract, breach of the covenant of good faith, wrongful foreclosure, breach of Nev. Rev. Stat. § 116.1113, and negligent misrepresentation are DISMISSED without prejudice.Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
October 5, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Bank of America, N.A. to Respond to 10 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 10/9/2015. Replies due by 10/26/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
July 29, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER Granting 14 Joint Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
June 6, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting 8 Stipulation to extend time for Monterosso Premier Homeowners to respond to complaint 1 (First Request). Response due June 19, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/08/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|