CH2E Nevada, LLC v. Mahjoob et al
Plaintiff: CH2E Nevada, LLC
Defendant: American Combustion Technologies of California, Inc. and Latif Mahjoob
Case Number: 2:2015cv00694
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that CH2E is ordered to file, within 14 days from the date of this order, either a notice of voluntary dismissal of its claims against Mahjoob, or an appropriate motion to prosecute its remaining claims. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 131 Motion for Default Judgment. CH2E shall prepare a proposed judgment consistent with this order and submit it to the court within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff CH2E Nevada, LLC and against Defendant American Combustion Technologies of California, Inc. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant ACTI is ORDERED to file its notice of appearance by new counsel no later than 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion to Continue. Mr. Carbajal shall have until 3:00 p.m. on 7/18/18 to serve Defendant ACTI with this order and the Court's order at Docket No. 107 , and shall file a proof of service no later than 4:00 p.m. on 7/18/18. Mr Carbajal is further ORDERED to notify Defendant ACTI via telephone of the hearing no later than 3:00 p.m. on 7/18/18, and include a statement confirming his conversation with Defendant ACTI in the proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Re: Defendant American Combustion Technologies of California, Inc.'s 108 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2018 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Responses to 108 Motion due by 7/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Re: 104 Status Report. The Court lifts the stay in this case as to Defendant ACTI. The case proceeds on the normal litigation track. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Re: 99 Notice of Bankruptcy. This case is stayed as to Defendant ACTI. Defendant ACTI shall file a status report regarding the status of its bankruptcy and automatic stay by 3/1/2018. Defendant ACTI shall file notice within 7 days of the dismissal of the bankruptcy case or the lifting of the automatic stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 97 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Defendant ACTI shall pay Plaintiff attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,020 within 30 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Any renewed motion shall be filed no later than 2/10/2017. If a renewed motion is filed that fails to comply in full with the Rules and the case law, the Court will deny Plaintiffs request for fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 66 Status Report. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit a joint interim status report that complies with the Local Rules, no later than December 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 55 Motion to Compel. Defendant must produce any and all documents responsive to Request Nos. 31, 32, and 33 by 12/19/2016. Defendant's request for attorneys' fees and costs is Denied. Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Joint Motion to Amend 20 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting Defendants' 7 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's first and third claims for fraudulent inducement are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CH2E Nevada, LLC v. Mahjoob et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Combustion Technologies of California, Inc.
Represented By: Carbajal & McNutt, LLP
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latif Mahjoob
Represented By: Carbajal & McNutt, LLP
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CH2E Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Edward Chang
Represented By: Abran E. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?