Rama Sou, et al. vs Michael Bash, et al.
Plaintiff: Tai Bui, Rama Sou and Scott Zimmerman
Defendant: Jeremy Bash, Michael Bash, Berkley Enterprises, Inc., Does, Ninety-Five Fort Apache Complex, LLC, Pepperdine Enterprises, Inc. and Royal View, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv00698
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before 5/10/19, the parties shall file either a stipulation to dismiss or a joint status report.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the settlement conference set for 3/19/19, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs against Defendant. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a proposed joint pretrial order that complies with the Local Rules on or before 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting in part 104 Motion for Case-Terminating Sanctions; denying 106 motion for summary judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that discovery will be reopened. These depositions must be completed by 12/29/2017. (See Order for Details) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 107 Stipulation to Strike and Replace Exhibits. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal ECF Nos. 103 -18 and 103 -26 and replace them with the redacted exhibits attached in ECF No. 107 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation for Pretrial Conferenc. ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2016 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 96 Request for Continuance of Hearing re 92 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel. ( Motion Hearing reset for 11/9/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Salisan Lee LLP and Michael B. Lee, P.C.'s 92 Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., October 21, 2016, in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Individual defendants and a representative for each defendant entity must appear in person. No motion for telephonic appearance will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 88 Motion for Telephonic Appearance. The call in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made 5 minutes prior to the hearing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 82 the motion to compel and motion for sanctions is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 9/16/16, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 83 Stipulated Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Matthew I. Knepper and Miles N. Clark added. Attorney Gordon R. Goolsby terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation. Defendants answers due 5/4/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that 57 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation for Withdrawal of Counsel, Michael Kwonchun Suh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically. Richard H. Lee will appear by telephone at the hearing set for 8/13/15 at 10:00 a.m. The call number is (702) 868-4911, access code: 123456. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that local counsel, Gordon R. Goolsby and Michael B. Lee must appear in person for the 8/13/15 10:00 a.m. hearing in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER that Defendants' counsel, Richard Hyungil Lee, Esq., must file his Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition pursuant to Local Rule IA 10 2 on or before July 30, 2015. Failure to comply with this Court's order will result in sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., August 13, 2015, in courtroom 3D. Defendants' local counsel must appear in person. Plaintiffs' counsel may appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rama Sou, et al. vs Michael Bash, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bash
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bash
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninety-Five Fort Apache Complex, LLC
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepperdine Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal View, LLC
Represented By: Richard Hyungil Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tai Bui
Represented By: Edward Suh
Represented By: Michael Kwonchun Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rama Sou
Represented By: Edward Suh
Represented By: Michael Kwonchun Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Zimmerman
Represented By: Edward Suh
Represented By: Michael Kwonchun Suh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?