Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Collegium Fund LLC-Series 31 et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: Collegium Fund LLC-Series 31 and Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
ThirdParty Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00700
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting 126 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; Status Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that Plaintiff Green Tree Servicing LLC must pay the amount of $1,277.50 to Defendant Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association, the amount of $2,231.25 to Third-Party Defendant Absolute Collection Services, and the amount of $3,3 25.00 to Defendant Collegium. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is to make the payments to Defendant Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association, Third-Party Defendant Absolute Collection Services, and Defendant Collegium by 10/19/2016 unless an objection is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are Denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that case is administratively STAYED. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court sanctions Plaintiff in the amount of Defendants reasonable attorneys fees and costs incurred in preparing for and attending the settlement conference for its failure to comply with this Courts Order Sched uling a Settlement Conference. 68 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Counsel for Defendants shall have up to and including August 24, 2016, to serve and file a memorandum. Counsel for Plaintiff shall up to and including September 7, 2016, in which to file a responsive memorandum. Counsel for Defendant shall have up to and including September 14, 2016, in which to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/2106. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Stipulation for Dismissal of Green Tree Servicing LLC's Third Cause of Action Only. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 40 Motion for Leave to File. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for November 10, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer re 27 Third Party Complaint. Absolute Collection Services, LLC answer due 8/31/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Amended Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Collegium Fund LLC-Series 31 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegium Fund LLC-Series 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Tierra De Las Palmas Owners Association
Represented By: Elizabeth B Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?