Marquis Aurbach Coffing v. Dorfman et al
Plaintiff: Marquis Aurbach Coffing, P.C.
Defendant: Terry Dorfman and T. Dorfman, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00701
Filed: April 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Amend Complaint, adding two new parties and six new claims. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended complaint pursuant to Local Rule 15-1(b) that is identical to that attached to the motion to amend, (ECF No. 45 ), within seven days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that 46 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that 52 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that 48 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's motion to seal exhibits 2-11 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to seal exhibits 13 and 14 and to redact certain portions of its motion to compel is GRANTED. No later than February 5, 2016, Plaintiff shall file its motion to compel on the public docket. It may seal exhibits 13 and 14 and redact lines 1-6 on page 6. Plaintiff's prior filing shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER re 46 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall CONFER with Melaleuca, Inc., and Melaleuca of Canada, Inc., no later than January 28, 2016, regarding the confidentiality designation of the subject document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that 41 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal its Motion to Compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Docket No. 41 shall remain under seal for the time being. No later than J anuary 29, 2016, Plaintiff shall refile a motion to seal any portion of Docket No. 41 that it requests to remain under seal. Plaintiff shall comply with the standards for sealing in the Ninth Circuit, as set out in this Order and all applicable caselaw. If Plaintiff fails to file such motion prior to January 29, 2016, the Court may order the documents at Docket No. 41 unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that 23 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for an Order Shortening Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying without prejudice 19 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a revised discovery plan no later than August 18, 2015, that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquis Aurbach Coffing v. Dorfman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Dorfman
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Represented By: Catherine Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dorfman, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Represented By: Catherine Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Aurbach Coffing, P.C.
Represented By: Terry A. Coffing
Represented By: Jared M. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?