July 26, 2016 |
Filing
75
ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 44 Motion to Amend Complaint, adding two new parties and six new claims. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended complaint pursuant to Local Rule 15-1(b) that is identical to that attached to the motion to amend, (ECF No. 45 ), within seven days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
69
ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER that 46 Motion to Seal is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
55
ORDER that 52 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER that 48 Motion to Seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's motion to seal exhibits 2-11 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to seal exhibits 13 and 14 and to redact certain portions of its motion to compel is GRANTED. No later than February 5, 2016, Plaintiff shall file its motion to compel on the public docket. It may seal exhibits 13 and 14 and redact lines 1-6 on page 6. Plaintiff's prior filing shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER re 46 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall CONFER with Melaleuca, Inc., and Melaleuca of Canada, Inc., no later than January 28, 2016, regarding the confidentiality designation of the subject document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER that 41 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 42 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal its Motion to Compel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Docket No. 41 shall remain under seal for the time being. No later than J anuary 29, 2016, Plaintiff shall refile a motion to seal any portion of Docket No. 41 that it requests to remain under seal. Plaintiff shall comply with the standards for sealing in the Ninth Circuit, as set out in this Order and all applicable caselaw. If Plaintiff fails to file such motion prior to January 29, 2016, the Court may order the documents at Docket No. 41 unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER that 13 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER that 23 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Defendants' Motion for an Order Shortening Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER Denying without prejudice 19 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit a revised discovery plan no later than August 18, 2015, that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|