Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Valencia Management LLC Series 4 et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: Silverado Court Landscape Maintenance Corporation and Valencia Management LLC Series 4
Case Number: 2:2015cv00725
Filed: April 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Granting 120 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 93 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 103 defendant's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting 111 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 103 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Replies due by 6/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying without prejudice 48 Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; 55 Motion for Summary Judgment and 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Denying as moot 68 parties stipulation and order for extension of time.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court certifies to the Nevada attorney general that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The attorney general shall have thirty (30) days within which to intervene on behalf of the state of Nevada for presentation of argument on the question of the constitutionality of the statute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 55 motion for Summary Judgment and 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply re 25 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint for Quiet Title and First Amended Answer to Counterclaim Plaintiff Valencia Management LLC Series 4'S First Amended Counterclaim by Green Tree Servicing LLC, now known as Ditech Financial. Replies due by 10/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Amend. First Amended Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint and Second Amended Counterclaims due 9/28/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Valencia Management LLC Series 4 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Court Landscape Maintenance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valencia Management LLC Series 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?