Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sunrise Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00753
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 56 plaintiff Wells Fargo's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 the HOA defendant's countermotion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 55 defendant SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the parties' 96 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Litigation be, and the same hereby is, Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation Dismissing Alfonso S. Razo and Maria D. Razo without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Sunrise Highlands Community Association's Motion to Dismiss 16 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court certifies to the Ne vada Attorney General that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The Attorney General shall have 30 days within which to intervene on behalf of the state of Nevada for presentation of argument on the question of the constitutionality of the statute.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) Certified copy to NV Attorney General.
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Oppose Defendant Sunrise Highlands Community Association's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/2/2015 re 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Highlands Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Blakeley E. Griffith
Represented By: Andrew M. Jacobs
Represented By: Amy F. Sorenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?