Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Alessi & Koenig LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sunrise Highlands Community Association |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00753 |
Filed: |
April 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 56 plaintiff Wells Fargo's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 64 the HOA defendant's countermotion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 55 defendant SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
97
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the parties' 96 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Litigation be, and the same hereby is, Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing
80
ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation Dismissing Alfonso S. Razo and Maria D. Razo without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 28, 2016 |
Filing
50
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant Sunrise Highlands Community Association's Motion to Dismiss 16 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this court certifies to the Ne vada Attorney General that it may rule on the constitutionality of the state statute at issue in this case, NRS 116.3116. The Attorney General shall have 30 days within which to intervene on behalf of the state of Nevada for presentation of argument on the question of the constitutionality of the statute.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS) Certified copy to NV Attorney General.
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Oppose Defendant Sunrise Highlands Community Association's Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/2/2015 re 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?