US Bank, National Association v. NV Eagles, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: US Bank, National Association
Defendant: Michael Cress, NV Eagles, LLC, Nevada Association Services, Inc., Sandstone Condominiums Homeowners Association and Underwood Partners, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: Michael Cress
ThirdParty Plaintiff: NV Eagles, LLC
Counter Claimant: NV Eagles, LLC
Counter Defendant: US Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv00786
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDERED that U.S. Bank's motions for summary judgment (ECF No. 130, 131, 147) are GRANTED. Within fourteen (14) days, U.S. Bank shall submit either a proposed form of judgment or a notice of its intent to prosecute any remaining claim.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that NV Eagles's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 134) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to file excess pages (ECF No. 132) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER approving ECF No. 138 Stipulation. Response re ECF No. 134 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/7/2016. Response re ECF No. 130 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying as moot ECF Nos. 66 , 74 , and 95 Motions for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 86 Counter Motion for Summary Judgment, and ECF No. 75 Motion to Strike; directing Defendants to respond to Amended Complaint by 6/24/2016; directing applications to extend any dates set by ECF No. 50 Scheduling Order be received no later than 5:00 p.m. 6/24/2016; vacating the 6/29/2016 Motion Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DIRECTING CERTIFICATION TO THE NEVADA ATTORNEY GENERAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 61 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF Discovery Deadlines (First Request). Discovery due by 12/23/2015. Motions due by 1/25/2016. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the direction of the district judge that trial be set on the trial stack closest to 120 days after the close of discovery, the trial date is set for May 2, 2016, at 9:00 a.m., with calendar call on April 25, 2016, at 10 a.m. before Judge Robert C. Jones.FURTHER ORDERED that absent compelling circumstances and a strong showing of good cause, no further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that 35 US Bank's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 54 US Bank's Motion to Amend is DENIED as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that 51 Motion to Substitute Attorney is APPROVED. Attorney Thomas Beckom is substituted in place and stead of Natalie C. Lehman and Dana Jonathon Nitz for plaintiff US Bank, National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that 28 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank, National Association v. NV Eagles, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Michael Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Vilkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandstone Condominiums Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwood Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: NV Eagles, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: US Bank, National Association
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank, National Association
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?