July 18, 2018 |
Filing
143
ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 2, 2018 |
Filing
141
ORDER that 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 135 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing
133
ORDER SCHEDULING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in my chambers - Room 3099 - not later t han Wednesday, 6/13/18. The Court's Order 131 setting Early Neutral Evaluation session, issued on 5/1/18 was set in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing
126
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 125 Proposed Pretrial Order is REJECTED. The parties shall personally confer as required in Local Rule 16-3, and submit a Joint Proposed Pretrial Order that complies with Local Rule 16-4 within 21 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 6, 2018 |
Filing
124
ORDER Granting 123 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 13, 2018 |
Filing
122
ORDER Granting 121 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
118
ORDER Granting 117 Stipulation to Extend Time re 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment . ( Replies due by 7/28/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 27, 2017 |
Filing
115
ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Extend Time re 107 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due by 6/30/2017.) Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 13, 2017 |
Filing
111
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall redact personal information from Exhibit 1 and file it unsealed. Exhibits 2, 3, 4, and 5 may be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 1, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 102 the plaintiffs' motion to seal is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 20 days of the date of this order, the plaintiffs shall file redacted, publicly accessible versions of ECF Nos. 75 and 92 consistent with this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 24, 2017 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation to Allow Deposition of Parent Doe After Close of Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
96
ORDER Granting 95 Motion to Seal Docket 94 . Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 18, 2016 |
Filing
73
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 the defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 the plaintiffs' motion to proc eed anonymously is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 35 the plaintiffs' motion to amend is GRANTED in part. On or before 9/12/16, the plaintiffs must file a renewed motion to amend with a proposed second amended complaint that corre cts the deficiencies identified in this order, if they can do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 the defendants' motion to strike or to file a sur-reply is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion to strike is denied. The motion to file a sur-reply is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 the defendants' motion for a hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting 33 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
October 26, 2015 |
Filing
25
ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to file Replies in support of 15 Motion to Dismiss and 16 Motion to Dismiss regarding Failure to Comply with Rule 10. Replies now due by 11/9/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|