J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Barajas et al
Plaintiff: |
J & J Sports Productions, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Timoteo Barajas and Timos Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00837 |
Filed: |
May 4, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Cable/Satellite TV |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 15, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER. The parties failed to appear at a hearing scheduled for 12/09/2015 at 3:30 p.m. The Court hereby ADMONISHES Plaintiff's counsel Richard Gunnerson and Defendant Timoteo Barajas that they must comply with all court orders and all applicable rules in the future. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/11/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
December 3, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER. The Court hereby SETS a scheduling conference on 12/09/2015 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe regarding 20 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Prior to the hearing, Plaintiff's counsel and Mr. Ba rajas shall familiarize themselves with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1.In addition, Mr. Barajas appears to be attempting to represented Defendant Timos, Inc. in this matter. Mr. Barajas i s advised that corporations may appear in federal court only through a licensed attorney. Mr. Barajas shall immediately attempt to obtain an attorney to appear on behalf of Defendant Timos,Inc., and shall be prepared to discuss the status of that process at the above hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/03/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing
19
ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Timoteo Barajas to file a joint proposed discovery plan no later than 12/03/2015. Failure to comply with this order will result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
November 4, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 11/10/2015. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/04/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER re 13 Order. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Timoteo Barajas to file the joint status report previously ordered no later than October 22, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?