Martinez v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Martinez
Defendant: Clark County Sheriff, Michael Donovan, Christian Esterline, L. Hancock and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2015cv00883
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re ECF No. 47 Motion for Stay of Plaintiff's Deposition. Response due by 3/13/2018. Reply due by 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting ECF No. 40 Defendant's motion for leave to take Plaintiff's deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING ECF No. 29 Letter from Mr. Bynoe. If Plaintiff requests relief from the Court's order at Docket No. 28 , he himself may file the appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; the Court's Report and Recommendation, Docket No. 13 is WITHDRAWN; Clerk is INSTRUCTED to file the second amended complaint, Docket No. 16 -1; the Clerk SH ALL ISSUE summons to Defendant Officer Michael Donovan AND DELIVER THE SAME together with a copy of this order and the second amended complaint to U.S. Marshal for service (e-mail to send to LV requesting distribution on 10/13/2017);Clerk SHALL SEND plaintiff (1) USM-285 forms (mailed to P on 10/13/2017); plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to furnish USM the USM-285 form; within 20 days after receiving from USM a copy of the USM-285 form showing whether service has been acco mplished, plaintiff must file a notice with the court identifying whether defendant was served or not; plaintiff shall serve upon defendant or defendant's counsel a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of mailing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING ECF Nos. 17 , 18 Motions for status check. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ECF No. 13 is accepted and adopted. It is further ordered that this action will proceed on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim against Defendant Michael Donovan only. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the Court allow this action to proceed on Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment claim against Defendant Donovan only re ECF No. 11 Amended Complaint filed by Miguel A. Martinez. Objections to R&R due by 7/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 06/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint; if Plaintiff chooses, the Second Amended Complaint is due by 2/21/2016; Clerk directed to send Plaintiff instructions, approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, and a copy of his first amended complaint ECF No. 11 (mailed 01/20/2017). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing Clerk to file complaint; dismissing complaint with leave to amend; giving Plaintiff until 5/26/2016 to file amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Esterline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?