Las Vegas Development Group, LLC v. 2014-3 IH Equity Owner, LP et al
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Defendant: 2014-3 IH Borrower, LP, 2014-3 IH Equity Owner, LP, 2014-3 IH Property Holdco, LP, Bank of America, N.A., Arnold Dumlao Dilag, Jocelyn Dilag, German American Capital Corporation, Meridian Foreclosure Service, THR Nevada II, LP, THR Property Borrower, LP, THR Property Guarantor, LP and THR Property Holdco, LP
Case Number: 2:2015cv00917
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. The Court DENIES summary judgment as per the 157 Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that summary judgment as to the issue of futility of tender is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that the parties have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file a jointly proposed pretrial order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 153 Stipulation - Bench Trial is reset for 1/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro. and that the Court set a new calendar call date pursuant to the new trial date. (Clerk's office has set the Calendar call for 1/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Gloria M. Navarro.) Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Re: 116 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 Stipulation; Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/18/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Stipulation; Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/11/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 124 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 118 Stipulation; Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 4/30/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 110 Stipulation; ORDER denying 111 Motion to Extend Time; Response to 86 Motion due within 14 days from entry of this order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020.This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Koppe for a Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Continue; Settlement Conference reset for 3/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Settlement statements must be submitted by 3:00 p.m. on February 28, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Settlement Conference reset in time only for 1/28/2020 at 01:00 PM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 101 Stipulation; Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment, 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting 91 Stipulation; Re: 87 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 10/10/2019. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that, absent leave for an extension being granted, the response to a discovery motion shall be filed within 4 days of the service of that motion and any reply shall be filed within 2 days of the service of the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due 14 days from entry of the instant Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Lift Stay of Case; denying 61 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Re: 42 Stipulation. The Court hereby SETS a hearing for 1:00 p.m. on 3/7/18, in Courtroom 3A. The Court will hear argument on the pending stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 32 Motion to Stay. Within 14 days of the resolution of that certified question, the parties shall file a joint report as to whether discovery should proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED ORDER. This Amended Order is being filed for the sole purpose of correcting the names and addresses of counsel in the Conclusion. All other aspects of the original 30 Order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy mailed to Nevada Supreme Court both locations: Carson City and Las Vegas - SLD)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 17 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the following question of law is CERTIFIED to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Rule 5 of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure (See Order). FURTHER ORDERED t hat the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the official seal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and pursuant to Order - JM)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The Court hereby DISCHARGES 26 Order to Show Cause. Counsel must comply with applicable deadlines in the future. The Court further STAYS this matter pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to 11 Amended Complaint. 2014-3 IH Property Holdco, LP answer due 9/14/2015; Christiana Trust answer due 9/14/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC v. 2014-3 IH Equity Owner, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014-3 IH Borrower, LP
Represented By: Christina H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014-3 IH Equity Owner, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014-3 IH Property Holdco, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Dumlao Dilag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Dilag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: German American Capital Corporation
Represented By: Christina H. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Foreclosure Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR Nevada II, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR Property Borrower, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR Property Guarantor, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THR Property Holdco, LP
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Las Vegas Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?