Aytch v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Martinez Aytch
Defendant: Renee Baker, B. Boone-Snapp, B. Edward and Healer
Case Number: 2:2015cv00958
Filed: May 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Dismiss.; granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 30 Motion to extend prison copywork limit.; granting 31 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 Aytch's request for additional time is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file his response to 32 , 36 the Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment by 2/28/17. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 14 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to send to plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his proposed amended complaint 14 -1. Amended Complaint due 7/8/16. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aytch v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinez Aytch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Boone-Snapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Edward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?